WY HJ0007 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-07 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Buchanan, Davison, Greene, Jaggi, Kroeker, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Peasley, Pederson, Quarberg and Semlek. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Kasperik, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Petersen, Petroff, Roscoe, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Shepperson Ayes 13 Nays 46 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to authorize the legislature to distribute to the citizens of this state surplus tax monies determined to be in excess of the amounts necessary for the support of current operations of government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distribution of excess funds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-07 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Buchanan, Davison, Greene, Jaggi, Kroeker, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Peasley, Pederson, Quarberg and Semlek. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Kasperik, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Petersen, Petroff, Roscoe, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Shepperson Ayes 13 Nays 46 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-07 (H) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
2011-02-03 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-03 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Campbell, Goggles, Miller, Petersen and Semlek M Nayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Childers and Vranish Excused: Representative(s) Madden Ayes 5 Nays 3 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-03 (H03) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-20 (H) Introduced and Referred to H03
2011-01-19 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback