WY HJ0005 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION to the United States Secretary of the Interior and the Director of the National Park Service relating to the collection of wildlife conservation fees at Yellowstone National Park and Grand Teton National Park.
Title
Yellowstone and Grand Teton wildlife conservation fees.
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Jim Allen [R] | Rep. Jamie Flitner [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Rep. Andy Schwartz [D] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - Concur:Passed 34-26-0-0-0 (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed HEJR No. 0002 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0002 |
2018-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0002 |
2018-03-08 | Assigned Number HEJR No. 0002 | |
2018-03-08 | House | Concur:Passed 34-26-0-0-0 |
2018-03-07 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-02 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-21 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 42-17-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-06 | Bill Number Assigned |