WY HJ0005 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-27 - (H) Passed 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to allow the legislature to provide for a procedure and laws governing unification of counties and municipalities; defining unified governments as counties for taxation and revenue purposes; providing legislative authority to further define powers and authority of unified governments; requiring a vote; and providing for continuance of debts and obligations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County/city consolidation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-10 - Senate - S07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - H07 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-01-27 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-01-26 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-01-25 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-24 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-24 (H07) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-20 (H) Introduced and Referred to H07
2011-01-19 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-18 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback