WY HJ0004 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-04 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to seek removal of the gray wolf and grizzly bear populations from listing under the endangered species act and to assist in funding programs and services for gray wolf and grizzly bear management.
Title
Gray wolves and grizzly bears.
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Jim Allen [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] |
Rep. Nathan Winters [R] | Sen. Stan Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 51-0-9-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 51-0-9-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001 | |
2016-03-04 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2016-02-29 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2016-02-29 | Assigned Number HEJR No. 0001 | |
2016-02-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2016-02-25 | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-18 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-3-1-0-0 |
2016-02-17 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | COW:Passed |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2016-02-12 | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel 51-0-9-0-0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |