WY HJ0004 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - 3rd Reading:Failed 7-22-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - 3rd Reading:Failed 7-22-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION petitioning Congress to call a convention to propose amendments to the Constitution of the United States to require a balanced federal budget.
Title
Balanced budget amendment resolution.
Sponsors
Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 7-22-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 7-22-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-23 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 7-22-1-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-23 - House - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 7-22-1-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-02-26 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-25 | Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-16-0-0-0 |
2015-01-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-23 | Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-08 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HJ0004.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Introduced/HJ0004.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2015/Digest/HJ0004.pdf |