WY HJ0004 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-24 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-24 - Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to require courts in this state to rely on federal and state laws when deciding cases and to forbid courts from considering international law when deciding cases.
Title
Foreign law prohibition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - H Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 9 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-24 | House | Failed CoW; Indef Postponed |
2013-01-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-22 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HJ0004.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HJ0004.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HJ0004.htm |