WY HJ0004 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-26 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to remove any mandatory retirement age for supreme court justices and judges of other courts in Wyoming.
Title
Mandatory judicial retirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Kermit Brown [R] | Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Rep. Keith Gingery [R] | Rep. John Patton [R] |
Rep. Frank Peasley [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-26 | (S02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-24 | (S01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2010-02-16 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-16 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-15 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-11 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-10 | (H01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HJ0004.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Introduced/HJ0004.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2010/Digest/HJ0004.htm |