WY HJ0003 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor Signed HEJR0003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress submit to the states a proposed amendment to the United States Constitution prohibiting the infringement of parents' rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution-parents' rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-07 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - H10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H10 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-13 Governor Signed HEJR0003
2012-03-07 (S) President Signed HEJR No. 0003
2012-03-07 (H) Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0003
2012-03-07 Assigned Number HEJR0003
2012-03-07 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-03-06 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-03-05 (S) Passed CoW
2012-03-02 (S) Placed on General File
2012-03-02 (S01) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-27 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2012-02-22 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-22 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-21 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-20 (H) Passed CoW
2012-02-16 (H) Placed on General File
2012-02-16 (H10) Recommended Do Pass
2012-02-14 (H) Introduced and Referred to H10
2012-02-13 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-01-30 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback