WY HJ0003 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-17 - (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION demanding Congress cease and desist from enacting mandates beyond the enumerated powers granted to the Congress by the United States Constitution; calling on Congress to amend the tenth amendment and the interstate commerce clause in article 1, section 8 of the United States Constitution so as to restrict the egregious encroachment on states' rights through federal legislation and federal court decisions; and demanding that the United States Supreme Court refrain from issuing decisions which impermissibly expand federal power or restrict individual rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution to Congress and the United States Supreme Court.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-17 (S) Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
2011-02-17 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Barnard, Case and Hines Nayes: Senator(s) Emerich and Perkins Ayes 3 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-17 (S03) Recommended Do Pass
2011-02-10 (S) Introduced and Referred to S03
2011-02-03 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-02-03 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Berger, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brechtel, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Gay, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Semlek, Shepperson, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Blake, Byrd, Connolly, Craft, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Goggles, Roscoe and Throne. Excused: Representative(s) Lockhart Ayes 49 Nays 10 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-03 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-02 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-01 (H) Passed CoW
2011-01-27 (H) Placed on General File
2011-01-27 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Brown, Cannady, Greene, Krone and Peasley Nayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Nicholas B and Throne Ayes 6 Nays 3 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-01-27 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2011-01-14 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2011-01-13 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback