WY HJ0002 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0002
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to remove the specific limit on the amount of debt a municipality can incur for a sewer project and to allow the legislature to prescribe by law the debt limit for municipal sewer projects; and to provide a ballot statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding sewage systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEJR No. 0002
2019-02-22SenatePresident Signed HEJR No. 0002
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed HEJR No. 0002
2019-02-21 Assigned Number HEJR No. 0002
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-13Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24House3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0
2019-01-23House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-17HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-17HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-15House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-15HouseH07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-07 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback