WY HJ0002 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to enact legislation permitting western states to enter into a voluntary compact to establish a graduated commercial driver licensing program that would allow commercial drivers between eighteen (18) and twenty-one (21) years of age to operate a commercial motor vehicle in a consenting, contiguous state.
Title
Commercial driver's license-compact agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2018-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2018-03-06 | Assigned Number HEJR No. 0001 | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-01 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-16 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 59-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |