WY HJ0001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - 3rd Reading:Laid Back
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to provide that for six years two-thirds (2/3) of state mineral royalties earned from the lease of state school lands may be appropriated by the legislature for the support of the public schools and providing a ballot statement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State lands mineral royalties-constitutional amendment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Recalled from Committee Pursuant to House Rule 5-6: 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-5-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 40-20-0-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-27House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-24HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-20HouseRecalled from Committee Pursuant to House Rule 5-6: 39-21-0-0-0
2020-02-18HouseH02 - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-5-0-0-0
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 40-20-0-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-12-30 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback