WY HJ0001 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting the swift delisting under the Endangered Species Act of the Greater Yellowstone Ecosystem grizzly bear population; requesting a return of the species management to local control; and requesting full federal funding of species management until delisting occurs.
Title
Wyoming support for delisting the grizzly bear.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - Concur:Passed 41-16-3-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor Signed HEJR No. 0001 | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed HEJR No. 0001 |
2019-02-14 | Assigned Number HEJR No. 0001 | |
2019-02-14 | House | Concur:Passed 41-16-3-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-05 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 |
2019-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-14 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |