WY HB1004 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned Chapter Number 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned Chapter Number 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the emergency expenses of government related to business relief; providing legislative findings; authorizing emergency governmental programs related to economic development and business relief as specified; providing appropriations; providing a sunset date for created emergency programs; providing rulemaking authority; authorizing transfers of appropriations as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
COVID-19 business relief programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - Senate - Adopted HB1004JC001: 25-0-2-0-3 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - House - Adopted HB1004JC001: 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - Amendment failed 23-36-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-16 - House - Adopted HB1004JC001: 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - Amendment failed 23-36-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Assigned Chapter Number 3 | |
2020-05-20 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0001 | |
2020-05-16 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0001 |
2020-05-16 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0001 |
2020-05-16 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0001 | |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-05-16 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Senate: Pursuant to JR 23-1 (h) referred directly to 3rd Reading |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-05-15 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2020-05-15 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-05-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-05-15 | House | Introduced and Referred to HCOW |
2020-05-15 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-05-12 | Bill Number Assigned |