WY HB0315 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Controlled Substance Act; amending property forfeiture provisions; exempting property from seizure and forfeiture as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture exemptions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2019-02-04HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback