WY HB0314 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - COW:Failed 26-30-2-0-2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to retirement benefits administered by the Wyoming retirement system; providing for additional noncumulative benefit payments under the Wyoming Retirement Act, the Wyoming State Highway Patrol, Game and Fish Warden and Criminal Investigator Retirement Act, the Wyoming Judicial Retirement Act, the Firemen's Pension Account Reform Act of 1981 and the volunteer firefighter and EMT pension account; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retiree cost-of-living payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - COW:Failed 26-30-2-0-2 (Y: 26 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Failed 26-30-2-0-2
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback