WY HB0310 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-21-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to education; providing for a study to create a grant program to make two years of education at Wyoming community colleges and the University of Wyoming as free as possible; creating a task force; specifying membership; providing parameters for the study and the program; creating an endowment fund; providing an appropriation for the study; providing for future implementation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming's tomorrow.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 8-21-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Amendment adopted 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0 (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Failed 8-21-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-13HouseH04 - Education:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-13SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-02-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 35-23-2-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-0-3-0-0
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback