WY HB0308 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school finance; modifying provisions of the state's public school funding system; amending provisions regarding state lands mineral royalties and related bonding provisions; creating an account; amending reimbursement provisions for transportation services within the education resource block grant model; repealing conflicting provisions; requiring rulemaking; providing applicability; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modernizing and balancing Wyoming's school funding streams.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0308JC002: 17-11-2-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - JCC Adoption Reconsideration Pursuant to SR 12-10 Passed by Roll Call 17-11-2-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Did Not Adopt HB0308JC002: 15-13-2-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0308JC002: 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - Concur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Amendment adopted 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Assigned Chapter Number 204
2019-03-15 Governor Signed HEA No. 0125
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0125
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0125
2019-02-27 Assigned Number HEA No. 0125
2019-02-27SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-27HousePursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2019-02-22SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-22HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-22HouseConcur:Failed 1-58-1-0-0
2019-02-21HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-19SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0308.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Engross/HB0308.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Enroll/HB0308.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0308.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#-502
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#5251
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#-839
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#502
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#533
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#5416
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#5502
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#649
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#651
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0308#652

Bill Comments

feedback