WY HB0304 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to postsecondary education; amending authorized academic programs at the community colleges; providing for community college commission approval of baccalaureate degree programs; conforming Hathaway scholarship statutes; creating reporting requirements; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community colleges-degree programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseDid Not Consider in CoW
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback