WY HB0293 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 206
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the University of Wyoming; providing for phase 1 and phase 2 of the University of Wyoming student housing project; providing for project parameters and requirements; amending the university supplemental bond program; providing legislative findings; providing a loan to defease existing outstanding University of Wyoming bonds; providing a line of credit for initial costs of construction; creating an account; providing an appropriation to the state loan and investment board for grants to the city of Laramie for a traffic study; providing an appropriation for legislative members of the task force; redirecting federal mineral royalties and requiring a corresponding reduction in the university standard budget request; continuing and providing additional duties to the University of Wyoming task force on housing; modifying membership of the task force; removing a moratorium on construction and construction related activities at the University of Wyoming; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UW student housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0293JC001: 16-12-2-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0293JC001: 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0293JC001: 44-15-1-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Failed 1-57-2-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Amendment adopted 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-15-4-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15 Assigned Chapter Number 206
2019-03-15 Governor Signed HEA No. 0124
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0124
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0124
2019-02-27 Assigned Number HEA No. 0124
2019-02-26SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Failed 1-57-2-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-20SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-15Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-15SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-02-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 41-15-4-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-31HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-01-29HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Introduced/HB0293.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Engross/HB0293.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Enroll/HB0293.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2019/Fiscal/HB0293.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#-448
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#5264
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#-823
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#-865
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#604
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#605
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#5466
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#5501
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2019/HB0293#650

Bill Comments

feedback