WY HB0291 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 14-15-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 14-15-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic and malt beverages; providing that a licensing authority may restrict the issuance of alcoholic and malt beverages pursuant to local zoning ordinances; prohibiting the imposition of restrictive requirements in a license as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages-licensing authority powers.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] |
Sen. Wyatt Agar [R] | Sen. James Anderson [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 14-15-1-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Bill Reconsideration Motion Failed by Roll Call 14-15-1-0-0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2019-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-15 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-0-1 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-8-0-0-0 |
2019-02-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-31 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |