WY HB0287 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; reducing education resource block grant model funding; including instructional facilitators, summer school and extended day programs within the education resource block grant model; modifying reimbursement for school district transportation and special education costs; establishing a select committee to recalibrate education costs; providing additional revenue for schools; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School finance amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0- (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 0-9-0- | |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2017-01-31 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |