WY HB0279 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public contracts and public funds; prohibiting public contracts with companies that boycott Israel as specified; requiring investment policies to limit investment of state funds and retirement funds in companies that boycott Israel; amending the duties of a trustee of the Wyoming Retirement System; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming anti boycott, divestment and sanctions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0- (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with House Rule 5-4: 1-6-0- | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-30 | Bill Number Assigned |