WY HB0277 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; confirming the ability of county treasurers to provide certificates of registration in electronic form as specified; amending requirements for the display of license plates, validation stickers and permits as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vehicle registration e-certificate and grace period.
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Larson [R] | Rep. Tony Niemiec [R] | Rep. Clark Stith [R] | Rep. Art Washut [R] |
Rep. Cody Wylie [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Stacy Jones [R] | Sen. John Kolb [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-02 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-02 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2023-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-26 | Bill Number Assigned |