WY HB0277 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties, cities and towns; modifying authority to impose zoning assessments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Town and county development regulations-2.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Clem [R] | Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Charles Scott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2019-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-31 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |