WY HB0271 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - COW:Failed 21-38-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to collective bargaining for firefighters; modifying definitions; providing for nonbinding arbitration; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighter collective bargaining-nonbinding arbitration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - COW:Failed 21-38-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-30 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Failed 21-38-1-0-0
2019-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-30HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback