WY HB0271 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Chapter No. 213 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to game and fish; modifying game bird farm license provisions relating to release of game birds; providing a limitation on game and fish commission regulation of the release of game birds by licensees; providing for certification of game bird farms to allow breeding, propagation, handling, taking, rearing and release of greater sage grouse; authorizing gathering of greater sage grouse eggs by certified game bird farms as specified; specifying requirements for certification; requiring rulemaking; providing a time limitation on certification and for disposition of greater sage grouse held at the expiration or revocation of certification; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game bird farms-greater sage grouse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-28 - House - Concur:Passed 47-13-0-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - Concur:Passed 47-13-0-0-0 (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20 Chapter No. 213 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
2017-03-20 Assigned Chapter Number
2017-03-20 Became Law without Governor's Signature
2017-03-01SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0091
2017-03-01HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0091
2017-03-01 Assigned Number HEA No. 0091
2017-02-28HouseConcur:Passed 47-13-0-0-0
2017-02-27HouseReceived for Concurrence
2017-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0
2017-02-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-23SenateCOW:Passed
2017-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2017-02-15SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2017-02-07SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0
2017-02-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-02HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-02HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-02HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2017-01-30HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback