WY HB0263 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - COW:Failed 12-16-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to postsecondary education and economic development; authorizing a pilot project to allow students attending community colleges to receive applied baccalaureate degrees conferred by the University; conforming Hathaway scholarship statutes; specifying certain programs to be reviewed for future inclusion by higher education institutions; specifying conditions for the pilot program; requiring reports; making legislative findings; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary education and economic development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - COW:Failed 12-16-2-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-2-3-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Failed 12-16-2-0-0
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-13SenateS04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2019-02-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-2-3-0-0
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2019-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback