WY HB0262 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 28 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Chapter No. 28 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming state penitentiary; creating the Wyoming state penitentiary capital construction account within the strategic investments and projects account; directing funds to the account as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Penitentiary savings fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] |
Sen. Drew Perkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill Laid Back Motion Failed 40-18-2-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill Laid Back Motion Failed by Roll Call 40-18-2- (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill Laid Back Motion Failed 40-18-2-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Bill Laid Back Motion Failed by Roll Call 40-18-2- (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Chapter No. 28 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0019 | |
2017-02-15 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0019 |
2017-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0019 |
2017-02-13 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0019 | |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-09 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0 |
2017-02-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Bill Laid Back Motion Failed 40-18-2-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-31 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-30 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |