WY HB0257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 87
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to medical assistance; requiring the department of health to include reimbursement for clubhouse rehabilitation services within the Medicaid program; authorizing the department of health to enter into contracts for clubhouse rehabilitation services; requiring reports; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Clubhouse-based psychosocial rehabilitation programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 87 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0065 | |
2019-02-22 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0065 |
2019-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0065 |
2019-02-21 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0065 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0 |
2019-02-20 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-13 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-05 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-30 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-30 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2019-01-25 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |