WY HB0256 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the administration of the government; providing procedures to enforce the integrity of the United States Constitution and to audit Wyoming's relationship with the federal government in accordance with that constitution; establishing the joint standing committee on federalism; establishing procedures for declaration of unconstitutional federal action; requiring all laws to comply with the state and federal constitutions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming sovereignty act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2021-03-22HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2021-03-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2021-03-04HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback