WY HB0255 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Hathaway scholarship program; repealing a provision excluding certain noncitizens from scholarship eligibility; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hathaway scholarship eligibility for noncitizens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-02 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-03HouseDid Not Consider in COW
2017-02-02HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-02HouseH04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
2017-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2017-01-27HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback