WY HB0251 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the legislature; authorizing the legislature or management council to commence and prosecute a lawsuit for the denial of permits for the construction of coal export terminals; providing legislative findings; creating an account; providing an appropriation; transferring funds as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coal export terminal litigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - Concur:Passed 50-8-2-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor Vetoed HEA No. 0117
2019-03-18 Veto Message Received
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0117
2019-02-26HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0117
2019-02-26 Assigned Number HEA No. 0117
2019-02-26HouseConcur:Passed 50-8-2-0-0
2019-02-26HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0
2019-02-22Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-21SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-20SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-02-19Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-02-08SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06House3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0
2019-02-05House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-31HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-31HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0
2019-01-29House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseH01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback