WY HB0251 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-25 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Cooper, Dockstader, Geis, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Meier, Nutting, Perkins and Ross. Nays: Senator(s) Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hines, Martin, Nicholas P, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Excused: Senator(s) Peterson Ayes 14 Nays 15 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion-ultrasound information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion-ultrasound information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-25 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Cooper, Dockstader, Geis, Hicks, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Meier, Nutting, Perkins and Ross. Nays: Senator(s) Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Hastert, Hines, Martin, Nicholas P, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Excused: Senator(s) Peterson Ayes 14 Nays 15 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-25 (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
2011-02-25 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-25 (S) Amendments Adopted
2011-02-18 (S) Placed on General File
2011-02-18 ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Bebout, Geis and Hicks Nayes: Senator(s) Driskill and Emerich Ayes 3 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-18 (S05) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-02-15 (S) Introduced and Referred to S05
2011-02-10 (S) Received for Introduction
2011-02-09 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blikre, Brechtel, Buchanan, Burkhart, Campbell, Cannady, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Gay, Gingery, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Jaggi, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Miller, Moniz, Nicholas B, Peasley, Pederson, Petersen, Quarberg, Semlek, Stubson and Teeters. Nays: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Byrd, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Goggles, Hunt, Illoway, Kasperik, Patton, Petroff, Roscoe, Steward, Throne, Vranish, Wallis, Zwonitzer, Dn. and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Excused: Representative(s) Shepperson Ayes 34 Nays 25 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-09 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2011-02-09 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-08 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2011-02-08 Amendment Failed
2011-02-08 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-08 Amendment Failed
2011-02-07 (H) Passed CoW
2011-02-07 Amendment Adopted
2011-02-07 (H) Amendments Adopted
2011-02-04 (H) Placed on General File
2011-02-04 ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Brechtel, Burkhart, Kroeker, Krone, Loucks, Madden and Teeters Nayes: Representative(s) Connolly and Freeman Ayes 7 Nays 2 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0
2011-02-04 (H04) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2011-01-31 (H) Introduced and Referred to H04
2011-01-31 (H) Received for Introduction
2011-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback