WY HB0250 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to post secondary education; making legislative findings; authorizing community colleges to confer baccalaureate degrees; providing for community college commission approval of a limited number of baccalaureate degree programs as specified; establishing a time-limited matching funds program to create community college baccalaureate degree programs; conforming Hathaway scholarship statutes; requiring a report; providing for an appropriation as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Community colleges-baccalaureate degree programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-29 | House | H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 4-4-1-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |