WY HB0249 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Appointed JCC01 Members
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Appointed JCC01 Members
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the investment of state funds; authorizing the purchase of real property assets and associated interests as specified; specifying requirements for the purchase; specifying sources of funding for the purchase; requiring the segregation of purchased assets based on funding source; specifying the distribution of earnings, income and royalties from purchased assets; creating the property tax reimbursement payment account; requiring reports; requiring approval by the legislature prior to execution of any purchase agreement; authorizing payments to local governments in lieu of property taxes as specified; specifying other required arrangements for the purchase and management of assets purchased; requiring recommendations; authorizing the retention of consultants; authorizing reviews, studies and recommendations as alternatives to executing any authorized purchase; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Investment of state funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] |
Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Andy Schwartz [D] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 53-4-3-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-11 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-03-11 | House | Concur:Failed 0-59-1-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-05 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 45-12-3-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-25 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 53-4-3-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |