WY HB0248 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to vital records; clarifying that vital records include vital records contained in books; clarifying the scope, duties and responsibilities of local officials who participate in activities associated with vital records; providing and amending definitions; removing obsolete language; establishing a deadline for certifying death files; clarifying requirements for unifying marriages; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vital records-amendments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2023-02-07HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2023-01-30HouseIntroduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
2023-01-25HouseReceived for Introduction
2023-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback