WY HB0248 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to game and fish; extending the time limitation on certification of greater sage grouse game bird farms; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sage grouse game bird farms-extension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseDid Not Consider in CoW
2019-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-30HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback