WY HB0248 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 30 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 2/24/2011 Assigned Number HEA0057 2/24/2011 H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0057 2/24/2011 S President Signed HEA No. 0057 3/2/2011 Governor Signed HEA0057 3/2/2011 Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 0080 Session Laws of Wyoming 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 30 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 2/24/2011 Assigned Number HEA0057 2/24/2011 H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0057 2/24/2011 S President Signed HEA No. 0057 3/2/2011 Governor Signed HEA0057 3/2/2011 Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 0080 Session Laws of Wyoming 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; providing criminal penalties for a protest directed at a funeral or memorial service as specified; increasing the buffer zone between a funeral or memorial service and a protest directed at a funeral or memorial service as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unlawful protesting at a funeral-amendments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Anderson, Barnard, Bebout, Burns, Case, Christensen, Coe, Cooper, Dockstader, Driskill, Emerich, Esquibel, F., Geis, Hastert, Hicks, Hines, Jennings, Johnson, Landen, Martin, Meier, Nicholas P, Nutting, Perkins, Peterson, Ross, Rothfuss, Schiffer, Scott and Von Flatern. Ayes 30 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 2/24/2011 Assigned Number HEA0057 2/24/2011 H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0057 2/24/2011 S President Signed HEA No. 0057 3/2/2011 Governor Signed HEA0057 3/2/2011 Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 0080 Session Laws of Wyoming 2011. | |
2011-02-24 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-23 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-22 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-15 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Senator(s) Cooper, Johnson, Landen, Nutting and Schiffer Ayes 5 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-15 | (S08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S08 | |
2011-02-09 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-04 | ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Blake, Bonner, Botten, Cannady, McKim, Petersen, Quarberg, Vranish and Zwonitzer, Dv. Ayes 9 Nays 0 Excused 0 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 2/4/2011 H Placed on General File 2/7/2011 H Passed CoW 2/8/2011 H Passed 2nd Reading 2/9/2011 H Passed 3rd Reading ROLL CALL Ayes: Representative(s) Barbuto, Berger, Blake, Blikre, Bonner, Botten, Brown, Buchanan, Burkhart, Byrd, Campbell, Cannady, Childers, Connolly, Craft, Davison, Edmonds, Eklund, Esquibel, K., Freeman, Gay, Gingery, Goggles, Greear, Greene, Harshman, Harvey, Hunt, Illoway, Jaggi, Kasperik, Kroeker, Krone, Lockhart, Loucks, Lubnau, Madden, McKim, McOmie, Moniz, Nicholas B, Patton, Pederson, Petersen, Petroff, Quarberg, Roscoe, Semlek, Steward, Stubson, Teeters, Throne, Vranish, Wallis and Zwonitzer, Dv.. Nays: Representative(s) Brechtel, Miller, Peasley and Zwonitzer, Dn.. Excused: Representative(s) Shepperson Ayes 55 Nays 4 Excused 1 Absent 0 Conflicts 0 | |
2011-02-04 | (H08) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H08 | |
2011-01-31 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-28 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/HB0248.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/HB0248.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Enroll/HB0248.pdf |