WY HB0247 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the broadband development program; modifying definition of unserved area; modifying rulemaking authority of the Wyoming business council; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband development program-amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26 Assigned Chapter Number 119
2019-02-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0068
2019-02-22SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0068
2019-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0068
2019-02-21 Assigned Number HEA No. 0068
2019-02-21Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2019-02-20Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-19SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-15SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-15SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-12Senate:Rerefer to S03 - Revenue
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2019-02-06SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-02-05House3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
2019-02-04House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-01HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-30HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-30HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback