WY HB0246 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to eminent domain; requiring condemnors to disclose affected property owners and to provide project maps as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Condemnation-disclosure of affected property owners.
Sponsors
Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Curt Meier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 | |
2017-02-03 | House | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Digest/HB0246.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Introduced/HB0246.pdf |
Supplement | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2017/Fiscal/HB0246.pdf |