WY HB0244 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - COW:Failed 23-36-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to medical assistance; requiring the department of health to enter into negotiations with the federal government to expand Medicaid; authorizing the department of health to seek work requirements and certain mental health services as part of an expansion of Medicaid; requiring specified notice relating to expansion activities; repealing expansion authority under certain circumstances; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid-work requirements and expansion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - House - COW:Failed 23-36-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseCOW:Failed 23-36-1-0-0
2019-02-01HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-01HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-01-31House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-31HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback