WY HB0244 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the state board of education; creating a director of the department of education appointed by the state board; specifying duties; providing for the election of members; modifying the appointment of members; providing conforming amendments; prescribing the transition for the department and director; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State board of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-31 - House - H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 |
2013-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0244.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0244.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0244.htm |