WY HB0243 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; repealing the Wyoming state penitentiary capital construction account; repealing the legislative deficit control account; providing for the transfer of funds from the repealed accounts; providing an annual transfer of funds to the school capital construction account; providing for transition of invested funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State accounts-elimination and transfer of funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. Cathy Connolly [D] | Rep. Steve Harshman [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] |
Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Chris Rothfuss [D] | Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-11 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |