WY HB0243 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to mine product taxes; providing an exemption for production of crude oil and natural gas in specified price environments and for specified periods; providing limitations on the exemption; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas tax-new production.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Adopted HB0243JC002: 21-6-3-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Adopted HB0243JC002: 39-16-5-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0243JC001: 25-25-10-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - Concur:Failed 15-44-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-17-3-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 48-9-3-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26 Assigned Chapter Number 155
2020-03-26 Governor Signed HEA No. 0097
2020-03-12SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0097
2020-03-12HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0097
2020-03-12 Assigned Number HEA No. 0097
2020-03-12SenatePursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-12HousePursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
2020-03-12SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2020-03-11HouseConcur:Failed 15-44-1-0-0
2020-03-11HouseReceived for Concurrence
2020-03-10Senate3rd Reading:Passed 21-8-1-0-0
2020-03-09Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2020-03-06SenateCOW:Passed
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on General File
2020-03-05SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2020-03-02SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-28House3rd Reading:Passed 40-17-3-0-0
2020-02-27House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2020-02-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2020-02-25HouseCOW:Passed
2020-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-20HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2020-02-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 48-9-3-0-0
2020-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-02-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Introduced/HB0243.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Engross/HB0243.pdf
Texthttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Enroll/HB0243.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/2020/Fiscal/HB0243.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#5214
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#-313
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#5404
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#-666
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#605
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#5538
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#5582
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#5587
Roll Callhttps://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2020/HB0243#666

Bill Comments

feedback