WY HB0243 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Motion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Motion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes; including assault and battery as predicate offenses to burglary; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Felony burglary.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Throne [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - Senate - S01 Motion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Motion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-01-31 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0243.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/HB0243.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/HB0243.htm |