WY HB0242 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state lands; authorizing leases of state lands for residential purposes; specifying lease requirements for residential leases of qualified state lands; amending and specifying lease terms; amending the scope of regulations concerning leases of state lands; providing definitions; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
State land leases-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-03-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-12 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |