WY HB0242 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to publication of legal notices; creating the statewide official notices website; requiring publication of legal notices on the official notices website rather than in a newspaper; providing for rulemaking; requiring reports; providing an appropriation; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide official notices website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - H07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Housepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-31HouseH07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 3-6-0-0-0
2019-01-25HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback