WY HB0240 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; exempting from licensing and other requirements a driver of an irrigation district vehicle when driven for operation and maintenance of irrigation facilities and equipment; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial vehicles-irrigation operations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseH:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
2019-02-04HouseNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-24HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback