WY HB0239 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to worker's compensation; providing for student learner agreements between eligible students, school districts, community colleges or technical schools, and employers; providing for the coverage of student learners under worker's compensation; specifying premiums and rates for employers to pay for covered student learners; specifying duties for the department of workforce services for student learners and student learner agreements; authorizing school districts, community colleges and technical schools to enter into student learner agreements; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Worker's compensation-student learner agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 160 | |
2021-04-15 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0078 | |
2021-04-06 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0078 |
2021-04-02 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0078 |
2021-04-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0078 | |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-31 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-03-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | Bill Number Assigned |